Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael H Watson
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:24-cv-01369
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 6:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Otterbein at Granville
Represented By
Daniel J. Knecht
Bricker Graydon LLP
contact info
Laura Dickenson Caty
Bricker Graydon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Weekly
Represented By
Daniel J. Knecht
Bricker Graydon LLP
contact info
Laura Dickenson Caty
Bricker Graydon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Janelle Kingstons
Represented By
Gregory T. Shumaker
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info
Trisha M. Breedlove
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/01 4:26 PM
NOTICE by Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly OF STIPULATED DISMISSAL (Knecht, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/02 9:29 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 03/12 9:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines pursuant to ECF No.21 and23 : Discovery due by 3/12/2025. Dispositive motions due by 4/11/2025. (agm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/11 11:44 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Review and Adjustment, which the Court construes as a Motion for Electronic Filing. The Motion (ECF No. 23) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff may participate in e-filing only as to this particular case and conditional on her compliance with all applicable e-filing requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/11/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/10 4:46 PM
MOTION to Review and Adjustment by Plaintiff Janelle Kingstons. (mas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 02/06 11:48 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Trisha M. Breedlove and Gregory T. Shumaker terminated. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, a notice indicating whether she has retained new counsel (in which case, Plaintiff's new counsel should also enter an appearance) or whether she intends to proceed pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/6/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 01/27 1:01 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Case Management Deadlines. The limited discovery deadline is extended to THIRTY (30) DAYS days following the appearance of replacement counsel for Plaintiff (or her confirmation that she is proceeding pro se). The dispositive motions deadline is set for SIXTY (60) DAYS following the dispositive motions deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/27/2025. (mas)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/24 11:51 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/4/2025. for Extension of Case Management Deadlines (Limited Additional Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines) by Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. (Knecht, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
19 19 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 01/15 9:58 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Janelle Kingstons. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Trisha M. Breedlove,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Wed 01/15 9:47 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff Janelle Kingstons (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
17 17 16 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/31 10:59 AM
Stipulated Protective Order signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/31/24. (sem)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 misc Proposed Pretrial Order Mon 12/30 1:49 PM
Proposed Pretrial Order - Stipulated Protective Order filed by Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. (Caty, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Form Protective Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Sanctions Wed 12/18 3:29 PM
ORDER granting Oral Motion to Compel; denying Oral Motion for Spoliation Sanctions. Parties are ORDERED to confer regarding a stipulated protective order as outlined, and Plaintiff is ORDERED to produce the settlement agreement once a protective order has been entered. The discovery deadline is EXTENDED for the limited purpose of completing the additional discovery discussed. Discovery due by 1/17/2025. Dispositive motions due by 2/17/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/18/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 12/18 10:56 AM
Statistical Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Telephone Conference held on 12/18/2024. (agm)
Related: [-]
motion Compel Sanctions Wed 12/18 3:24 PM
ORAL MOTION to Compel, ORAL MOTION for Spoliation Sanctions by Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. (agm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
13 13 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Mon 10/21 9:42 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in December 2024 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm EST on 10/31/2024 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
12 12 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order Tue 05/21 4:55 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: 5/24/24 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is VACATED. Case is referred to Mediation. Case referred to Clerk for assignment of mediator. Motions or stipulations addressing the parties or pleadings, if any, due by 6/28/2024. Initial Disclosures due by 5/23/2024. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Dispositive motions due by 12/20/2024. Primary Expert due by 10/18/2024. Rebuttal Expert due by 10/18/2024. Settlement Demand due by 5/24/2024. Response to Settlement Demand due by 6/7/2024. Mediation Deadline: December 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 5/21/24. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
11 11 misc Rule 26(f) Report Fri 05/17 10:45 AM
RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. (Knecht, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/03 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 5/24/2024 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/02 10:55 AM
Defendants Otterbein at Granville and Jennifer Weekly's ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by All Defendants. (Caty, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/01 3:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Otterbein at Granville. (Knecht, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Dickenson Caty for Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly (Caty, Laura)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/30 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Knecht for Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly (Knecht, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/25 9:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Otterbein at Granville, c/o Registered Agent. (er)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/17 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. Otterbein at Granville served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024; Jennifer Weekly served on 4/15/2024, answer due 5/6/2024. (mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 misc Certificate of Clerk Thu 04/11 12:26 PM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk- A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to named defendants via certified mail. (mas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/26 9:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Otterbein at Granville, Jennifer Weekly. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/25 5:08 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9884674), filed by Janelle Kingstons. (Shumaker, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form Summons x3,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet