Lemoine v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert R Summerhays |
Referred: | David J Ayo |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00420 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 15th JDC, 24-00864 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:08 PM CDT |
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine Lemoine
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Response to Removal Order
Thu 04/18 11:24 AM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co .(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court record | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Removal Order
Thu 03/28 2:56 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David J Ayo on 3/28/2024. (crt,Taylor, L) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/27 1:05 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 11:43 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Martin, Mary Katherine) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 11:42 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. (aty,Martin, Mary Katherine) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Tue 03/26 10:29 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 03/26 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Victor Wade Rushing, Mary Katherine Paine Martin on behalf of Christine Lemoine, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Tue 03/26 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Mary Katherine Paine Martin on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/9/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC, Case Number 2024-0864 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5895245) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co.(Attorney Mary Katherine Paine Martin added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Martin, Mary Katherine) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Citation and Petition | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Tue 03/26 10:19 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co answer due 4/1/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 10:24 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge David J Ayo. (crt,Crick, S) |