Blach et al v. Valladares Lagos et al
West Virginia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Preston Bailey |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00059 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuirt Court of Ohio County, West Virginia, CC-35-02024-C-37 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
North Star Painting Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Martir Javier Valladares Lagos
|
|
Plaintiff
Jaycameron Blach
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marina Blach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/25/2024 6:40 PM EDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia, (case number CC 35-2024 C-37), filed by North Star Painting Co., Inc. Filing Fee $405. Receipt #AWVNDC-3909583.(nmm) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Docket Sheet from State Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service via certified mail to North Star, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Ohio Secretary of State page, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Letter to Haydee Lopez, Sedgwick Claims, dated 10/6/23, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - copy of Notice of Removal to State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Certified State Court records, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/22/2024; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/6/2024; Initial Disclosures due by 5/20/2024. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/25/2024. (nmm) |