M. v. Indiana University Health et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Cecilia M Romero |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00221 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 5:07 PM MDT |
Defendant
Indiana University Health Inc
|
|
Defendant
Indiana University Health Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan
|
|
Defendant
Indiana University Health Plans
|
|
Plaintiff
Ian M.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
5
pgs
order
Order to Propose Schedule
Tue 03/26 12:11 PM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 03/26/2024. (haa) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Mon 03/25 2:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Indiana University Health Inc, Indiana University Health Inc. Health and Welfare Benefit Plan, Indiana University Health Plans (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5010369) filed by Ian M.. (King, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/25 3:10 PM
Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00221-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |