Carter v. Johnson et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Referred: | Wes Reber Porter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00138 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Thu 04/25 11:13 AM
EO: Before the Court is pro se Plaintiff Samuel Carter's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner [ECF No.4]. On March 28, 2024, the Court denied Plaintiffs original IFP application [ECF No. 2] because it was incomplete [ECF No. 3]. In denying the original IFP application, the Court instructed Plaintiff to submit a complete application that included, among other things, account statements for the preceding six months showing all deposits to and withdrawals from Plaintiff's inmate account. The account statements that Plaintiff submitted in support of his renewed IFP Application show that he received deposits of $79.62 and $72.85, on April 10, 2024, and April 15, 2024, respectively. The accompanying descriptions state that these deposits were Plaintiff's "own money," and that they came from "BOH." In his renewed IFP Application, however, Plaintiff states that he has no sources of income, savings, or assets. Based on the account statement entries, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing on or before May 23, 2024, why his IFP application should be granted. If Plaintiff has other sources of income, savings, or assetsas his account statements seem to suggesthe must provide the source and amount of any such income, and the value of any other savings or assets. ALTERNATIVELY, Plaintiff can submit the $405.00 in fees associated with this action. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/24 12:59 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Samuel Carter(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/28 9:05 AM
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER, ECF NO.2 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/28/2024. (1) Carter's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner is DENIED without prejudice as incomplete. (2) Carter is DIRECTED to pay the filing fee in full, or to submit a complete IFP Application by April 29, 2024. (3) The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Carter an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner to facilitate compliance with this Order. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Samuel Carter has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/25 2:06 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Samuel Carter (eta) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 2:03 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Samuel Carter.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Documentation |