ProNM Energy Inc. v. United States Department of Interior et al
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Steven C Yarbrough |
Referred: | Laura Fashing |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00293 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 6:08 PM MDT |
Defendant
Bureau of Indian Affairs
|
|
Defendant
Debra Anne Haaland
|
|
Defendant
Maureen Joe
|
|
Defendant
Bertha L Shorty
|
|
Defendant
United States Department of Interior
|
|
Plaintiff
ProNM Energy Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
Summons Issued as to Civil Process Clerk c/o U.S. Attorney, Albuquerque office. (bc) | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
Summons Issued as to Maureen Joe, Bertha L Shorty, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jg) | ||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
2 | 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint IN MANDAMUS AND TORT by JAKE GALLEGOS PRONM ENERGY INC (Gallegos, Jake) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT IN MANDAMUS AND TORT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by JAKE GALLEGOS PRONM ENERGY INC.(Gallegos, Jake) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9280983 re1 Complaint filed by JAKE GALLEGOS PRONM ENERGY INC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Gallegos, Jake) | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |