Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC et al v. Trisura Insurance Company
New Mexico District Court | |
Judge: | Kevin R Sweazea |
Referred: | Jennifer M Rozzoni |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00296 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Case in other court: | First Judicial District Court, D-117-CV-24-00081 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 25, 2024 6:09 PM MDT |
Defendant
Trisura Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 16 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC, 17 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Trisura Insurance Company. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr) | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Trisura Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Malone, Cassandra) | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
15 | 15 RESPONSE to Motion re6 First MOTION to Strike Jury Demand and Motion to Stay filed by Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC. (Gooch, Christina) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Gooch, Christina) | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
Association Dues: re; 8, 10, 12 $ 300.00 paid, receipt number # 1004571 (da) | ||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE by Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC re 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, (Gooch, Christina) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE by Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, (Gooch, Christina) | |
9 | 9 NOTICE by Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, (Gooch, Christina) | |
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Benjamin Gonsoulin Baker Botts L.L.P. 910 Louisiana Street Houston, Texas 77002 (713) 229-1234 ben.gonsoulin@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Gooch, Christina) | ||
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Alexis Ammons Baker Botts L.L.P. 910 Louisiana Street Houston, Texas 77002 (713) 229-1234 lexie.ammons@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Gooch, Christina) | ||
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Jicarilla Solar 1, LLC, Repsol Renewables Development Company, LLC by Christina Muscarella Gooch on behalf of: Nischay K. Bhan Baker Botts L.L.P. 30 Rockefeller Plaza New York City, NY 10112 (212) 408-2500 nischay.bhan@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Deliver Payment) (Gooch, Christina) | ||
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 First MOTION to Strike Jury Demand and Motion to Stay by Trisura Insurance Company. (Malone, Cassandra) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Jicarilla Solar 1 Project EPC | ||
5 | 5 Trisura's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Trisura Insurance Company. (Malone, Cassandra) | |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trisura Insurance Company (Malone, Cassandra) | |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 5/6/2024 at 10:30 AM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni. Joint Status Report due and Provisional Discovery Plan by 4/29/2024. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 4/16/2024. (kms) | |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trisura Insurance Company from First Judicial District Court, case number D-117-CV-2024-00081. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Trisura Insurance Company.(Malone, Cassandra) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Jennifer M. Rozzoni assigned. (eh) | ||
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) |