Sinclair Funding Group Inc. v. The Bennett Law Group LLC et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth A Wolford |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06174 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
Merit Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
The Bennett Law Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Sinclair Funding Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Merit Bennett
The Bennett Law Group LLC 460 Street Michael's Drive, Ste 703
Santa Fe, NM 87505 |
|
Defendant
Merit Bennett PC
|
|
Defendant
The Bennett Law Group LLC
460 St. Michael's Drive, Ste. 703
Santa Fe, NM 87505 |
|
Defendant
Tinkler & Bennett
|
|
Plaintiff
Sinclair Funding Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/22 2:01 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC. (JHF) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 04/09 10:30 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2024. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/09/2024. (CDH)(A copy of this Order to Show Cause was mailed to all parties) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/28 3:25 PM
MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC. (JHF) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Continuation of Exhibits
Thu 03/28 3:23 PM
CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to1 Notice of Removal filed by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC. (JHF) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification No Signature
Mon 03/25 12:04 PM
E-Filing Notification: Document missing attorneys electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature and new proof of service re1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC. Removal missing index. Action required: file index under event CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS. LR 81(3)(A). E-filing mailed and emailed to the attorney. (TF) |
||
utility
Remark
Mon 03/25 12:08 PM
Remark: If you are not admitted in the WDNY you must either file a motion to appear Pro hac vice or seek admission in this District and register to file and receive service of documents electronically through the district's Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system (CM/ECF). The registration form and attorney admission instructions and forms can be located on the Court's Public Web site at www.nywd.uscourts.gov. Entry emailed and mailed to attorneys (TF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/25 12:17 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (TF) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Mon 03/25 12:17 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] .' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(TF) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 03/25 12:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Sinclair Funding Group, Inc. by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC.(TF) |
|
Att: 1 Counterclaims | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Merit Bennett, The Bennett Law Group LLC.(TF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 03/25 12:37 PM
Filing fee: $405.00, receipt number 600000748. (TF) |