HANLON v. Northrop Grumman Corporation et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00306 |
Nature of Suit | 315 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
COLLINS AEROSPACE
|
|
Defendant
Northrop Grumman Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ROCKWELL COLLINS ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS
|
|
Defendant
RTX Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rockwell Collins, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rolls-Royce North America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
SAFRAN ELECTRICAL & POWER USA, LLC
|
|
Defendant
SAFRAN ELECTRICAL AND POWER
|
|
Plaintiff
JAMES J. HANLON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Waiver of service executed
Wed 04/17 2:40 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/09/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Rolls-Royce North America, Inc.. (Gagliano, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
service
Waiver of service executed
Tue 04/16 10:10 AM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/10/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Gagliano, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Tue 04/09 1:48 PM
ENDORSED ORDER discharging 6 Order to Show Cause. Based on the allegations contained within Plaintiff's 15 Amended Complaint and 16 Response, the Court is satisfied that complete diversity has been adequately alleged at this stage of the proceedings. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/9/2024. (MDJ) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Response to order to show cause
Mon 04/08 2:11 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re6 Order to show cause filed by James J. Hanlon.(Gagliano, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 04/08 1:13 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by James J. Hanlon.(Gagliano, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/02 6:38 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Collins Aerospace, RTX Corporation, Rockwell Collins Electro Mechanical Systems. (Gagliano, John) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/02 6:36 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Collins Aerospace, Rockwell Collins Electro Mechanical Systems, Rockwell Collins, Inc.. (Gagliano, John) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/02 4:15 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Safran Electrical & Power, Safran Electrical & Power USA, LLC. (Gagliano, John) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/02 3:53 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Rolls-Royce North America, Inc.. (Gagliano, John) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/02 3:36 PM
RETURN of service executed on 03/27/2024 by James J. Hanlon as to Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Gagliano, John) |
|
9 | 9
service
Proof of service
Tue 04/02 11:05 AM
COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT CASE EVENT -- PROOF of service by James J. Hanlon (Gagliano, John) Modified text on 4/2/2024 (JK) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of service
Tue 04/02 11:04 AM
COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT CASE EVENT -- PROOF of service by James J. Hanlon (Gagliano, John) Modified text on 4/2/2024 (JK) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proof of service
Tue 04/02 11:03 AM
COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT CASE EVENT -- PROOF of service by James J. Hanlon (Gagliano, John) Modified text on 4/2/2024 (JK) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Fri 03/29 1:19 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE on or before April 11, 2024, as to why the Complaint should not be dismissed for want of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/28/2024. (CKS) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of service
Wed 03/27 1:43 PM
PROOF of service by James J. Hanlon (Gagliano, John) |
|
4 | 4
service
Proof of service
Wed 03/27 1:14 PM
PROOF of service by James J. Hanlon (Gagliano, John) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Tue 03/26 12:02 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Northrop Grumman Corporation, RTX Corporation, Rockwell Collins, Inc., Rolls-Royce North America, Inc., Safran Electrical & Power USA, LLC. (EAM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 8:27 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-306-WWB-PDB. (AJS) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 9:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21908430) filed by JAMES J. HANLON.(Gagliano, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons |