Geico Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Galen Manternach v. Fluid Motion LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00583 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Beijing Epsolar Technology Co., Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Blue Sea Systems
|
|
Defendant
Fluid Motion LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kisae Technology Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Monroe Harbor Marina now known as Downtown Sanford Marina
|
|
Defendant
Ranger Tugs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Universal Power Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Geico Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Galen Manternach
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/25 4:02 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Complete Service of Process on Certain Defendants by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Wamser, Val) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 3:12 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fluid Motion LLC, Ranger Tugs. (Campbell, Jackson) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/12 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jackson Thomas Campbell on behalf of Fluid Motion LLC, Ranger Tugs. Lead Counsel: Jackson Campbell. (Campbell, Jackson) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/10 4:18 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Wamser, Val) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 4:17 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Geico Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent National Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for Geico Marine Insurance Company.. (Wamser, Val) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 04/10 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael C. Black on behalf of Geico Marine Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Val E. Wamser. (Black, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/08 12:30 PM
ORDER granting 8 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Val E. Wamser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/8/2024. (RMN) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/05 5:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Val E. Wamser to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21954181 for $150 by Geico Marine Insurance Company.(Black, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit certification | ||
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/02 6:10 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Fluid Motion LLC, Ranger Tugs.(Campbell, Jackson) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 10:03 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Wed 03/27 9:31 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/27/2024. (MEH) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 9:31 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 3/27/2024. (MEH) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 6:57 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/27/2024. (JOR) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 3:54 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-583-CEM-EJK. (TNP) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/25 5:46 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Seminole County, case number 2023-CA-004232 filed in State Court on 12/27/2023. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21908197 filed by Ranger Tugs, Fluid Motion LLC.(Campbell, Jackson) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |