Demarion v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William F Jung |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00752 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of service executed
Mon 04/08 12:45 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 04/08/2024 by Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/01 11:22 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion. Related case(s): No (Kerney, Frank) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Mon 04/01 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Frank H. Kerney, III on behalf of Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion. Lead Counsel: Frank H. Kerney, III. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/01 11:17 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion. (Kerney, Frank) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 9:28 AM
NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Wed 03/27 9:27 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (GL) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Wed 03/27 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 4:04 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-752-WFG-NHA. (TNP) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 7:02 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21908321) filed by Rosalia Magdalina Maria Demarion.(Kerney, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons EQ, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons EXP |