Eathridge v. Instant Brands LLC et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Bridget Meehan Brennan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00555 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 1:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corelle Brands, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Instant Brands LLC
|
|
Defendant
Instant Brands, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nakita Eathridge
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Order
Wed 03/27 9:07 AM
Initial Standing Order signed by Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 3/27/2024. (H,AR) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 10:06 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Corelle Brands, LLC, Instant Brands LLC, Instant Brands, Inc.. (H,Ch) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form | ||
4 | 4
oth_doc
Supplement (atty event)
Tue 03/26 9:42 AM
Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Nakita Eathridge. Related document(s)1 . (Beridon, Alyson) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 03/26 10:01 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (H,Ch) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/26 10:04 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong. (H,Ch) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (atty event)
Mon 03/25 7:02 PM
Notice of Stay filed by Nakita Eathridge.(Beridon, Alyson) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - In re: Instant Brands Aquisition Holdings, Inc, et al - Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order (1) and (II) | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (atty event)
Mon 03/25 6:57 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure for Nakita Eathridge filed by Nakita Eathridge. (Beridon, Alyson) |
|
1 | 1
15
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/25 6:52 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Corelle Brands, LLC, Instant Brands LLC, Instant Brands, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12474998.. Filed by Nakita Eathridge. (Beridon, Alyson) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Owner's Manual, | ||
Att: 3 Summons for Instant Brands LLC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons for Instant Brands, Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Summons for Corelle Brands, LLC |