Greenleaf Compassionate Care Center, Inc. v. Santacroce, et al
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00282
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01259 |
Type | civil / private / constitutional |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MATTHEW SANTACROCE, in his official capacity as Deputy Director of the Rhode Island Department of Business Regulation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ERICA FERRELLI, in her official capacity as Chief of the Office of Cannabis Regulation within the Rhode Island Department of Business Regulation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KIMBERLY AHERN, in her official capacity as Chair of the Rhode Island Cannabis Control Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT JACQUARD, in his official capacity as Commissioner on the Rhode Island Cannabis Control Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
OLAYIWOLA ODUYINGBO, in his official capacity as Commissioner on the Rhode Island Cannabis Control Commission
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
LOCAL 328 OF THE UNITED FOOD AND COMMERCIAL WORKERS UNION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
GREENLEAF COMPASSIONATE CARE CENTER, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #45) filed by Appellant Greenleaf Compassionate Care Center, Inc.. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 04/08/2024. 24-1259 (GRC) | ||
Att: 1 14 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |