Byrne v. Ally Financial Inc.
Original Case: 1:23-cv-00460
First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-civil-01291 |
Type | civil / private / other statutes |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
ALLY FINANCIAL INC.
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JODIE LOUISE BYRNE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 4:16 AM EDT |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14) filed by Appellant Jodie Louise Byrne. Fee due 04/08/2024. 24-1291 (AVN) | ||
Att: 1 34 pgs Abbreviated Record | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF |