Original Case: 6:21-cv-01574

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.pr-01248
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ZFTRANSMISSIONS GRAY COURT LLC
Represented By
William Joseph Farley III
TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ZF NORTH AMERICA INC
Represented By
William Joseph Farley III
TROUTMAN PEPPER HAMILTON SANDERS LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THS CONSTRUCTORS INC
Represented By
Norman Ward Lambert
HARPER LAW FIRM, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
EAST COAST STORAGE EQUIPMENT CO INC
Represented By
Adam C. Bach
TONNSEN BACH, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 4:15 AM EDT
Monday, March 25, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-01574-TMC. Case manager: AWalker. [1001542161] 24-1248 AW [Entered: 03/25/2024 04:22 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 7 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 6:21-cv-01574-TMC. [1001542165] 24-1248 AW [Entered: 03/25/2024 04:25 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 Attorney Emily Rebecca Godwin for East Coast Storage Equipment Co Inc in 24-1248 terminated from case. Reason for termination: Not participating. [1001542166] 24-1248 AW [Entered: 03/25/2024 04:26 PM]
Related: [-]