Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:24-cv-00303
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 4:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Spruce Services, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron Stenzler Weiss
Carlton Fields PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Crystal Saleh
Represented By
Manuel S. Hiraldo
Hiraldo P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, August 22, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/22 12:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Crystal Saleh. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/28 4:45 PM
ORDER--The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal or agreed judgment and anyappropriate supporting documents on or before Friday, July 19, 2024.. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 06/26 8:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Crystal Saleh (Hiraldo, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Wed 05/15 2:20 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order., Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/14 8:26 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Spruce Services, Inc..(Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/24 10:58 AM
Text Order GRANTING6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. It is therefore ORDERED that Spruce Services, Inc.'s answer or responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before Tuesday, May 14, 2024. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Wed 04/24 2:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Spruce Services, Inc. answer due 5/14/2024. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/23 8:50 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Spruce Services, Inc.. (Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/23 8:49 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Stenzler Weiss on behalf of Spruce Services, Inc.. Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party Spruce Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 04/05 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Saleh. Spruce Services, Inc. served on 4/4/2024, answer due 4/25/2024. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 04/02 8:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Spruce Services, Inc.. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/26 3:00 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Crystal Saleh. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 2:59 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18570072), filed by Crystal Saleh.(Hiraldo, Manuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/02 7:56 AM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Tue 04/02 7:57 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
Related: [-]