New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:24-cv-02253
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 4:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Artizan Coffee Company
Represented By
David Seltzer
Seltzer Mayberg, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Toro
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, December 16, 2024
31 31 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 12/16 12:02 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JULIO ABRIL,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Supp. Abril Decl.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibits F-L to Supp. Abril Decl.
Friday, December 06, 2024
30 30 order Endorsed Letter Fri 12/06 4:10 PM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Seltzer re: COMES NOW the Defendant Artizan Coffee Company by and through undersigned counsel and files this Unopposed Amended Third Motion for Extension of Time to reply to Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint [D.E. 26]. In furtherance of the motion, the defendant states as follows: As further set forth by this Order. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/6/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Endorsed Letter Fri 12/06 9:02 AM
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from David Seltzer re: SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [D.E. 26]. ENDORSEMENT: Although the Court is amenable to granting a short extension, Defendant does not explain why today's CM/ECF outage warrants a one-week extension of time to file its reply, which is not due until tomorrow. Defendant shall either file its reply tomorrow or submit another extension request explaining why today's outage justifies an extension. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/5/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/26 1:56 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Application granted. SO ORDERED. Replies due by 12/6/2024.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/25 3:38 PM
FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to20 MOTION to Dismiss .,26 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
26 26 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/14 1:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Expert Robert D. Moody
Friday, October 11, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 10/11 4:25 PM
ORDER granting24 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/11/2024) (ar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 10/10 6:22 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (with Consent) addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mars Khaimov, Esq. dated 10/10/2024. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 10/04 4:09 PM
ORDER terminating16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (arc)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order Fri 10/04 4:07 PM
ORDER: Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs first amended complaint (ECF No. 20) moots the pending motion to dismiss Plaintiffs original complaint (ECF No. 16). Accordingly, the motion pending at ECF No. 16. shall be terminated. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams) (Text Only Order) (arc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
21 21 28 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 10/03 5:58 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:20 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration
20 20 motion Dismiss Thu 10/03 5:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 09/06 9:48 AM
MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/5/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/06 9:50 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Artizan Coffee Company answer due 10/4/2024. (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/04 5:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Amended Complaint (Unopposed) . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/23 5:36 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Artizan Coffee Company with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Andrew Toro. Related document:1 Complaint..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 11 pgs motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 08/02 5:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 07/22 4:16 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting14 Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/22/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/22 4:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Artizan Coffee Company answer due 8/2/2024. (tg)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 21, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time Sun 07/21 6:16 PM
FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT . Document filed by Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Sun 07/21 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Seltzer on behalf of Artizan Coffee Company..(Seltzer, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/05 8:02 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Artizan Coffee Company served on 7/1/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. Service was accepted by Naomi Comerford. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 06/26 11:48 AM
ORDER granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Service due by 7/25/2024.. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/26/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 06/25 12:27 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Mars Khaimov dated 6/25/24. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof of attempted service 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proof of attempted service 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proof of attempted service 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proof of attempted service 4
Monday, June 03, 2024
9 9 respoth Declaration in Support (non-motion) Mon 06/03 11:39 AM
DECLARATION of Robert D. Moody in Support re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
8 8 order Memo Endorsement Wed 05/29 5:20 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:7 Status Report filed by Andrew Toro. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter by June 29, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/29/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Tue 05/28 11:59 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 11:56 AM
ORDER On March 28, 2024, the Court ordered the parties to meet and confer regarding settlement within 30 days of service of the summons and complaint, and within 15 additional days, to submit a joint letter requesting either (1) referral to mediation or a magistrate judge, or (2) an initial status conference. To date, no letter has been filed. The parties shall submit their joint letter no later than May 28, 2024. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/28 1:05 PM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/28/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/27 3:06 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Artizan Coffee Company..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/26 9:33 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Artizan Coffee Company, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/26 9:31 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 9:30 AM
COMPLAINT against Artizan Coffee Company. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29129710)Document filed by Andrew Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]