Su v. Medhealth Suppliers & Providers Inc. et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00311 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
defendant
MEDHEALTH SUPPLIERS & PROVIDERS INC. D/B/A EVERGREEN PLACE, EVERGREEN PLACE 2, AND BEDFORD HOME, a Michigan corporation; and
|
|
defendant
ROSELINE ROWAN, an individual,
|
|
plaintiff
JULIE A. SU
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 04/16 11:44 AM
Copy of Order on Motion for Order, Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment,6 sent via U.S. Mail to Roseline Rowan and Medhealth Suppliers & Providers Inc. (eod) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
Mon 04/15 2:56 PM
ORDER striking stipulated proposed consent order and judgment3 ; denying as moot motion to approve consent judgment and order4 ; the Clerk of Court shall immediately serve a copy of this Order on Defendants Rowan and Medhealth; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw) |
|
5 | 5
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of a Motion
Mon 04/15 10:25 AM
MEMORANDUM in support of MOTION to approve consent judgment4 filed by Julie A. Su (Faklis, Lydia) Modified text on 4/15/2024 (mlc) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Approve Consent Judgment
Mon 04/15 10:23 AM
MOTION to approve consent judgment 3 by plaintiff Julie A. Su (Faklis, Lydia) Modified text on 4/15/2024 (mlc) |
|
3 | 3
11
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 04/15 10:02 AM
MOTION for Consent Order and Judgment with Exhibit A by plaintiff Julie A. Su; (Faklis, Lydia) Modified text on 4/15/2024 (mlc) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 03/26 1:22 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (eod) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT with Exhibit A against Medhealth Suppliers & Providers Inc.and Roseline Rowan, filed by Julie A. Su (Faklis, Lydia) Modified text on 3/26/2024 (eod) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 03/26 9:45 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lydia Faklis on behalf of plaintiff Julie A. Su (Faklis, Lydia) Modified text on 3/26/2024 (eod) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Tue 03/26 1:24 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Medhealth Suppliers & Providers Inc., Roseline Rowan (none provided) (eod) |