California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00188
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 12:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Ron Gad (1)
Represented By
Mark Werksman
Werksman Jackson And Quinn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Angela C. Makabali
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/31/2025 2:00 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Ron Gad in violation of 18:2252A(a)(2). Approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim as to Ron Gad (1). (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 Summons Returned Executed on 2/20/2024, as to Ron Gad (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
6 6 7 pgs MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo as to Defendant Ron Gad. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged. Attorney: Mark Werksman for Ron Gad, Retained, present. Court orders bail set as: Ron Gad (1) 250,000-Appearance bond, SEE ATTACHED BOND FOR ADDITIONAL CONDITIONS. Defendant Ordered to report to U.S. Marshal for processing. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/14/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 3/19/2024 11:30 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Court Smart: CS 2/22/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Ron Gad is directed to appear for Preliminary Hearing on March 14, 2024 at 11:30 AM and for Post Indictment Arraignment on March 19, 2024 at 11:30 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs DESIGNATION AND APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL; filed by Mark Werksman appearing for Ron Gad (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Ron Gad, declaring that I have been issued a passport or other travel document(s), but they are not currently in my possession. I will surrender any passport or other travel document(s) issued to me, to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency by the deadline imposed. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Ron Gad. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
11 11 PASSPORT RECEIPT from U. S. Pretrial Services as to Defendant Ron Gad. USA passport was received on 2/22/2024. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OR REASSIGNMENT of AUSA Angela C. Makabali on behalf of Plaintiff USA. Filed by Plaintiff USA. (Makabali, Angela) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
13 13 STIPULATION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Post-Indictment Arraignment from March 14, 2024 and March 19, 2024 to May 1, 2024 and May 3, 2024, respectively filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ron Gad(Makabali, Angela) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
14 14 2 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth as to Defendant Ron Gad, DENIED re Stipulation to Continue,13 . (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
15 15 3 pgs Amended STIPULATION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Post-Indictment Arraignment from March 14, 2024 and March 19, 2024 to May 1, 2024 and May 3, 2024 , respectively, filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Ron Gad(Makabali, Angela) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 2 pgs AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY HEARING AND POST-INDICTMENT ARRAIGNMENT by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim as to Defendant Ron Gad, re Stipulation to Continue,15 . New PH date: April, 30 2024 at 11:30 am. New PIA date: May 3, 2024 at 11:30am. (jb) [2:24-mj-00944-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
20 20 6 pgs BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Ron Gad conditions of release: $250,000.00 Appearance Bond approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ja)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (Property) in the amount of $250,000 by surety: Nicole Nava Gad for Bond and Conditions (CR-1)20 for property located at: 12020 Magnolia Blvd., Valley Village, CA 91607; filed by Defendant Ron Gad. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ja)
Related: [-]
22 22 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety CR-3, PROPERTY filed by Defendant Ron Gad re: Affidavit of Surety (Property)(CR-3),21 (ja)
Related: [-]
23 23 2 pgs REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (Property) in the amount of $250,000 by surety: Rivka Gad for Bond and Conditions (CR-1)20 for property located at: 12020 Magnolia Blvd., Valley Village, CA 91607; Certified copy of Deed of Trust filed by Defendant Ron Gad. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ja)
Related: [-]
24 24 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety CR-3, PROPERTY filed by Defendant Ron Gad re: Affidavit of Surety (Property)(CR-3),23 (ja)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs REDACTED AFFIDAVIT OF SURETIES (Property) in the amount of $250,000 by surety: Rivka Gad for Bond and Conditions (CR-1)20 for property located at: 12020 Magnolia Blvd., Valley Village, CA 91607; Certified copy of Deed of Trust filed by Defendant Ron Gad. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ja)
Related: [-]
26 26 SEALED UNREDACTED Affidavit of Surety CR-3, PROPERTY filed by Defendant Ron Gad re: Affidavit of Surety (Property)(CR-3),25 (ja)
Related: [-]
27 27 26 pgs BOND REMARK: REDACTED Certified Short Form Deed of Trust filed by Rivka Gad and Nicole Nava Gad, Co-Trustees located at Valley Village, CA 91607 as reflected on instrument number 20240157548 naming the Clerk of Court as Beneficiary therein on the property re defendant Ron Gad. (ja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Property Tax Bill,
Att: 2 Lot Book Report
28 28 SEALED UNREDACTED Short Form Deed of Trust filed by Defendant Ron Gad re: Bond Remark,27 (ja)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
17 17 5 pgs INDICTMENT Filed as to Ron Gad (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Angela C Makabali as to Defendant Ron Gad; defendants Year of Birth: 1974 (mhe)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]