Bamba v. Dominion Financial Services, LLC
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | S Kato Crews |
Referred: | N Reid Neureiter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00826 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 3:15 AM MDT |
Defendant
Dominion Financial Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abass Yaya Bamba
995 South Locust Street
Denver, CO 80224 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
91 | 91
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/01 2:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service by USPS by Clerk of Court re 89 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,, Order on Report and Recommendations,,,,,, to Abass Yaya Bamba at 995 South Locust Street, Denver, CO 80224. Text Only Entry (sadhi, ) |
|
90 | 90
utility
Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC
Tue 10/01 1:43 PM
Civil case administratively closed pursuant to 89 Order. Text Only Entry. (jrobe, ) |
|
89 | 89
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 10/01 1:33 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter's88 Report and Recommendations. Judge Neureiter recommends this case be stayed and administratively closed pending the resolution of Plaintiff's bankruptcy case in the United States Bankruptcy Court, District of Colorado, case no. 24-11589 MER. The Recommendation states that objections to the Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days after its service on the parties. Dkt. 88 at pp.4-5; see also 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(C). The Recommendation was served on August 22, 2024, and no party has objected. In the absence of an objection, the district court may review a magistrate judge's recommendation under any standard it deems appropriate. See Summers v. Utah , 927 F.2d 1165, 1167 (10th Cir. 1991). In this matter, the Court has reviewed the Recommendation to satisfy itself that there is "no clear error on the face of the record." Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b), advisory committee's note to 1983 amendment. Based on this review, the Court concludes the Recommendation is thorough, well-reasoned, and a correct application of the facts and law. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that: The Recommendation of Judge Neureiter is ADOPTED and this case shall be STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, subject to being reopened on motion of either party at the conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings. Defendant's 49 Motion to Dismiss is terminated without prejudice and Dominion is given leave to refile if the case is reopened. SO ORDERED by Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/1/2024. Text Only Entry (skclc1) |