22
|
|
22
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
|
21
|
|
21
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Dismissal
Fri 04/26 12:14 AM
Notice of Dismissal Related [+] (Admin.)
|
20
|
|
20
order
Dismissing Case (Court Action)
Tue 04/23 4:22 PM
Order Dismissing Case Related [+] (Lazo, Tatiana)
|
19
|
|
19
court
Hearing held
Tue 04/23 11:45 AM
Hearing held; for the reasons articulated on the record, the case is dismissed. Appearances: Cecelia Weschler and Peter Zemanian were both present in-person; Marc A. Cox (Manager of Debtor) dialed in and appeared remotely via Cisco CM Related [+] (JenniferHinkle)
|
17
|
|
17
misc
Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists
Fri 04/19 12:24 PM
Non-Individual Schedule(s) and/or Statement(s), Lists filed by 1333 Baecher Lane VA, LLC.(Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit(s)
|
16
|
|
16
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure
Sun 04/07 12:15 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Procedure (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Sun 04/07 12:15 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 13 Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
|
14
|
|
14
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 04/05 12:14 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
|
13
|
|
13
court
BNC Forms Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors
Thu 04/04 11:13 AM
Request for Notice of Meeting of Creditors. 341 meeting to be held on 5/6/2024 at 01:00 PM at Norfolk-NN Divisions (11): Office of the U.S. Trustee, Telephonic meeting - see notice for details. Proof of Claims due by 8/5/2024. Complaint for Determination of Dischargeability of Debt due by 7/5/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 9/23/24. (Avery, Demetria)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 9 Deficient Filing Notice Request No VS Gorman
|
11
|
|
11
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Thu 04/04 12:18 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 8 LBR 1007-1, and/or 1007-3, and/or 3015 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
10
|
|
10
1
pgs
order
Order Extending Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements; and Hearing Thereon
Tue 04/02 4:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements LBR 1007-1; and Hearing Thereon. Related [+] Incomplete Filings due by 4/22/2024. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Thomas, Stephanie)
|
9
|
|
9
court
Deficient Filing Notice Request No VS Gorman
Mon 04/01 4:22 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to 1333 Baecher Lane VA,LLC regarding If corporate debtor: not accompanied by corporate resolution authorizing filing and/or not signed by attorney. [See LBR 1074-1]; and Hearing Thereon. Related [+] Document(s) due by 4/15/2024. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria)
|
8
|
|
8
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Mon 04/01 3:56 PM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/9/2024. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Avery, Demetria)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
court
Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry
Mon 04/01 3:26 PM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Gibbs, Latanya)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
|
6
|
|
6
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Deficient Filing
Sun 03/31 12:13 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Notice of Deficient Filing Issued
|
5
|
|
5
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency
Sun 03/31 12:13 AM
Notice of LBR 1007-1 Deficiency Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 2 LBR 1007-1, and/or 1007-3, and/or 3015 Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
|
4
|
|
4
motion
Extend Time to File Lists Schedules and/or Statements
Fri 03/29 4:40 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Lists, Schedules and/or Statements filed by 1333 Baecher Lane VA, LLC. (Hall, Linda)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Deficient Filing Notice Request
Wed 03/27 9:10 PM
Notice of Deficient Filing Issued to Thomas U Gage, Vice Manager regarding Requirement of Counsel Related [+] Document(s) due by 4/10/2024. (Glenn, Jillinda)
|
2
|
|
2
court
1 - Case Filing/Plan Deficiency
Wed 03/27 8:58 PM
LBR 1007-1 Schedule(s) and/or Statement Deficiency; and Hearing Thereon. Incomplete Filings due by 4/9/2024. Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at Chief Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Glenn, Jillinda)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
7
pgs
misc
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition
Tue 03/26 1:42 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Filed by 1333 Baecher Lane VA, LLC. (Louis, Christy)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt of Petition Filing Fee
Tue 03/26 8:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by CL. Receipt Number 170956. (Adi123)
Related: [-]
|