Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 3:24-cv-08059
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 3:32 AM MST
Defendant
Corelle Brands LLC
Defendant
Instant Brands Incorporated
Defendant
Instant Brands LLC
Plaintiff
Daniel Fisher
Represented By
Richard Phillip Traulsen
Begam Marks & Traulsen PA
contact info
Michael K Johnson
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info
Adam J Kress
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info
Kenneth W Pearson
Johnson Becker PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, October 07, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/07 9:35 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the claims against Defendants continue to be stayed and will be dismissed without further notice on June 30, 2025, unless the court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted, or a request for a lifting of the bankruptcy stay has not been ruled upon by the bankruptcy court, or the parties file a Stipulation of Dismissal beforehand. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 10/7/2024. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 misc Report - Status Mon 09/30 11:44 AM
STATUS REPORT by Daniel Fisher. (Traulsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Fri 05/03 10:50 AM
Remark: Out of state attorney Kenneth W Pearson terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 04/29 2:03 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael K Johnson, Adam J Kress on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Fisher. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 3:07 PM
NOTICE re: Suggestion of Bankruptcy by Instant Brands LLC . (Jue, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/27 2:46 PM
ORDER - The claims against Defendants are stayed and will be dismissed without further notice on 9/30/24, unless the court is advised that the bankruptcy stay has been lifted, or a request for a lifting of the bankruptcy stay has not been ruled upon by the bankruptcy court, or the parties file a Stipulation of Dismissal beforehand. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/27/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/26 11:00 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Stay by Daniel Fisher .(Traulsen, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 03/26 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Corelle Brands LLC, Instant Brands Incorporated, Instant Brands LLC. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 03/26 10:26 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22879856. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-08059 PCT-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 03/26 10:23 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Fisher. (Traulsen, Richard) (DXD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 10:22 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-22879856 filed by Daniel Fisher. (Traulsen, Richard)(DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet