Broadnax v. Knight et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Laura Lothman Lambert |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00308 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 8:57 AM
ORDER granting 2 plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and assessing the $350 filing fee; directions to the clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 4/9/2024. (CAW) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 04/02 1:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/2/2024. (CKS) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants
Wed 03/27 9:49 AM
NOTICE to pro se litigant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 3/27/2024. (CAW) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 12:21 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marcus Tyrone Broadnax.(BD) |
|
Att: 1 Inmate Account Statement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Marcus Tyrone Broadnax. (No service copies) (BD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope |