Thompson v. Indebted USA, Inc.
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Wendy W Berger |
Referred: | Patricia D Barksdale |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00311 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Indebted USA, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Amber Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 04/02 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Tue 04/02 1:48 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/2/2024. (CKS) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued
Wed 03/27 3:15 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Indebted USA, Inc. (LSS) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 3:14 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:24-cv-311-WWB-PDB. (RLK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 12:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Indebted USA, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21911140) filed by Amber Thompson.(Lane, Gerald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |