Kadir v. Scottsdale Insurance Company
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Anne C Conway |
Referred: | Robert M Norway |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00589 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Judith Makinson v. Scottsdale Insurance Company, 2024-CA-000619 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Marshall Dennehey, P.C. 2400 East Commerical Blvd. Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judith Makinson
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 04/25 6:44 PM
ORDER Denying 8 Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company SHALL FILE its answer to Plaintiff Judith Makinson's Complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 4/25/2024. (KLD) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to motion
Fri 04/19 3:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Judith Makinson. (Lambert, Randy) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/08 3:45 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Kuhn Raslavich, P.A., Other Affiliate Marshall Dennehey PC, Other Affiliate Judith Makinson for Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Packer, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Mon 04/08 3:31 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Packer, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended document (NOT Motion)
Fri 04/05 5:02 PM
AMENDED document by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal Amended Petition for Removal .(Packer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response to order to show cause
Fri 04/05 3:32 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re6 Order filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NOIL, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Policy | ||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Wed 04/03 9:51 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Judith Makinson. Related case(s): No (Lambert, Randy) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/03 9:45 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Judith Makinson. (Lambert, Randy) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/02 4:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Packer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Interested Persons Order
Fri 03/29 1:55 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/29/2024. (KLD) (KLD) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/28 11:51 AM
ORDER. Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company is ORDERED to show cause within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded for failure to adequately plead the requisite amount in controversy to support federal subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 3/28/2024. (KLD) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Wed 03/27 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Randy Eugene Lambert on behalf of Judith Makinson. Lead Counsel: Randy E. Lambert. (Lambert, Randy) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/26 6:05 PM
NOTICE by Scottsdale Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Exhibits(Packer, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Service and Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Notice of Intent to Litigate and Estimate | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael A. Packer on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Michael A. Packer. (Packer, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 4:21 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:24-cv-589-ACC-RMN. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 12:32 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Judith Makinson v. Scottsdale Insurance Company, case number 2024CA000619 filed in State Court on March 5, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21910296 filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Wright, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents State Court documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |