Badua et al v. First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The)
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Daniel C Irick |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00590 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Orange County Circuit Court, 20204-CA-001797-O |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:13 PM EDT |
Defendant
First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The)
Kathryn Keller, Esq. Traub Lieberman 55 Street South
St. Petersburg, FL 33701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christina Badua
Daniel Ilani, Esq.
The Property People FL, PA 11618 |
|
Plaintiff
Roger Badua
Daniel Ilani, Esq.
The Property People FL, PA 11618 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 8:50 AM
ORDER. This cause is before the Court on the Case Management Report filed by the parties (Doc. 13 ). The report indicates that the parties have not yet agreed on a mediator. Therefore, the parties are directed to confer and advise the Court on the selection of a mediator and the mediation date within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/17/2024. (KM) |
|
14 | 14
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Wed 04/17 8:49 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2024. Discovery due by 3/3/2025. Dispositive motions due by 4/1/2025. Pretrial statement due by 7/15/2025. All other motions due by 7/22/2025. Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 1/6/2025. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2025 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Jury Trial set for the trial term commencing on 9/2/2025 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/17/2024. (KM) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 04/16 5:39 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keller, Kathryn) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/08 7:31 PM
NOTICE by Christina Badua, Roger Badua of Filing Disclosure Statement (Neary, Brian) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/08 7:21 PM
NOTICE by Christina Badua, Roger Badua of No Pendency of Other Actions (Neary, Brian) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/05 10:42 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of appearance
Tue 03/26 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Neary on behalf of Christina Badua, Roger Badua (Neary, Brian) |
|
8 | 8
order
Interested Persons Order
Tue 03/26 3:31 PM
INITIAL CASE ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/26/2024. (KM) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Tue 03/26 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Daniel M. Ilani and Nicole S. Houman of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 2:24 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-590-PGB-DCI. (AJS) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/26 11:59 AM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The).(Keller, Kathryn) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 11:55 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The) identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The), Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company for First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The). (Keller, Kathryn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 03/26 11:53 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The). Related case(s): No (Keller, Kathryn) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 03/26 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kathryn A. Keller on behalf of First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The). Lead Counsel: Kathryn A. Keller, Esquire. (Keller, Kathryn) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange Circuit Civil, case number 2024-CA001797-O filed in State Court on February 29, 2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21910531 filed by First Liberty Insurance Corporation (The).(Keller, Kathryn) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet Current State Court Docket, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit State Court File, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Property Appraiser Records, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit SSPOL, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Estimate - Plaintiff's, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Estimate - Liberty's, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit NOF Ntc of Removal, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |