Vaught v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Hala Y Jarbou |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00313 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:12 PM EDT |
defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
plaintiff
Sally B. Vaught
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 04/26 1:57 PM
SUMMONS returned executed; Equifax Information Services LLC served on 3/29/2024, answer due 5/19/2024 |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 04/18 12:34 PM
STIPULATED ORDER extending time for defendant to answer complaint by 5/19/2024; ordering plaintiff to file proof of service by 4/25/2024; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (bgs) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/18 10:53 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC (Bolton, Jordan) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Thu 04/18 10:51 AM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER re. Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (Bolton, Jordan) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Thu 04/18 10:50 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jordan S. Bolton on behalf of defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (Bolton, Jordan) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 3:25 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Equifax Information Services LLC (pjw) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 03/26 3:16 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (pjw) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Tue 03/26 2:05 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax Information Services LLC filed by Sally B. Vaught |
|
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 03/26 2:01 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Sally B. Vaught in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7330358 |