Barkhauer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Lioi |
Referred: | Amanda M Knapp |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00560 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy
Wed 03/27 9:46 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S) |
|
5 | 5
order
Magistrate Judges Initial Order
Wed 03/27 9:45 AM
Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. The transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1 and this Order. Compliance with all requirements set forth in this Order is expected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 3/27/2024. (S,S) |
|
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Wed 03/27 9:43 AM
Order [non-document] granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis . Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 3/27/2024. (S,S) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Initial Order - Judge Lioi
Tue 03/26 3:12 PM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/26/2024. (B,DL) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A - Witness List, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List | ||
3 | 3
order
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order
Tue 03/26 3:06 PM
Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Sara Lioi. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/26/2024. (B,DL) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 1:57 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Rebekah L Barkhauer. Related document(s)1 . (Shifrin, Debra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 1:56 PM
Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Rebekah L Barkhauer. (Shifrin, Debra) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Tue 03/26 3:03 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/26 3:04 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (B,DL) |
||
oth_evt
Notice of Social Security Complaint
Tue 03/26 3:05 PM
Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (B,DL) |
||
order
Automatic Reference of Administrative Action
Tue 03/26 3:08 PM
Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/26/2024. (B,DL) |