LOCALOC, INC
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 3:24-bk-50287 |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 29, 2024 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 04, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
LOCALOC, INC
2740 Spirit Rock Trl
Reno, NV 89511-5374 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
CHAPTER 11 - RN
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
trustee
341 Meeting Concluded - Assets (11)
Mon 04/29 2:25 PM
341 Meeting Concluded (DAY, JARED) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Schedules/Declaration Re Schedules
Tue 04/23 6:29 PM
Amended Non-Individual Schedule[s] A/B, Real Property Amount: $ 0, Personal Property Amount: $ 29,590, , Amended Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/23 11:27 AM
Stipulation By LOCALOC, INC and Between UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Mon 04/22 3:45 PM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/15 9:46 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Confirmation Hearing
Mon 04/15 9:39 AM
Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Plan Hearing Date: 06/05/2024 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/04 10:38 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Balance Sheet
Wed 04/03 11:47 AM
Statement of Operations for Small Business , Cash Flow Statement for Small Business , Balance Sheet Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/03 9:55 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Hearing (BK)
Wed 04/03 9:51 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 04/24/2024 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Shortening Time (Bk)
Tue 04/02 3:49 PM
Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time . Hearing scheduled 4/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (mmm) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (BK)
Mon 04/01 4:15 PM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/5/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (mmm) |
|
27 | 27
misc
Attorney Information Sheet (Bk)
Mon 04/01 2:51 PM
Attorney Information Sheet Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
26 | 26
order
Approval of Procedures
Mon 04/01 12:25 PM
Order Granting Motion for Approval of Procedures , Granting Motion to Set Deadlines for Balloting (mmm) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Notice
Fri 03/29 9:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Approval of Procedures
Fri 03/29 3:40 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Approval of Procedures , Motion to Set Deadlines for Balloting with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Declaration (BK)
Fri 03/29 3:18 PM
Declaration Of: KEVIN A. DARBY, ESQ. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
22 | 22
2
pgs
motion
Order Shortening Time (Bk)
Fri 03/29 3:15 PM
Motion for Order Shortening Time Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Declaration (BK)
Fri 03/29 3:08 PM
Declaration Of: DAVID SILVA Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
20 | 20
12
pgs
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 03/29 3:07 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
19 | 19
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (BK)
Fri 03/29 11:50 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 5/8/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (mmm) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 03/29 9:34 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Declaration (BK)
Fri 03/29 9:28 AM
Amended Declaration Of: KEVIN A. DARBY, ESQ. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
utility
Add Trustee
Fri 03/29 11:44 AM
NATHAN F. SMITH added to case (mmm) |
||
utility
Terminate Trustee
Fri 03/29 11:48 AM
Terminated Trustee CHAPTER 11 - RN (mmm) |
||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 03/28 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/28/2024. (Admin.) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Hearing (BK)
Thu 03/28 5:56 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 05/08/2024 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/28 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement Filed by CAMERON M GULDEN (GULDEN, CAMERON) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
trustee
Appointment of Trustee
Thu 03/28 4:31 PM
Appointment of Trustee Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (GULDEN, CAMERON) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Appearance (BK)
Wed 03/27 2:53 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 11 (DAY, JARED) |
|
11 | 11
order
Set Hearing (BK)
Wed 03/27 12:38 PM
Order to Set Hearing. Status Hearing to be held on 5/8/2024 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Pre-Status Report Due By 4/24/2024. (dcl) |
|
10 | 10
court
Notice of Docketing Error (BNC) (BK)
Wed 03/27 10:31 AM
Notice of Docketing Error (mmm) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Declaration (BK)
Tue 03/26 11:33 AM
Declaration Of: KEVIN A. DARBY, ESQ. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
8 | 8
9
pgs
motion
Employ (BK)
Tue 03/26 11:33 AM
Application to Employ DARBY LAW PRACTICE, LTD as REORGANIZATION COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR with Proposed Order Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Tax Documents
Tue 03/26 11:16 AM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 . This document contains sensitive information and cannot be viewed by the public. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Resolution of Board of Directors
Tue 03/26 11:14 AM
Resolution of Board of Directors Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
5 | 5
11
pgs
plan
Ch 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan
Tue 03/26 11:11 AM
Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Tue 03/26 11:09 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-50287 ) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A21678556, fee amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Tue 03/26 11:06 AM
|
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Tue 03/26 11:05 AM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC (DARBY, KEVIN) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11
Tue 03/26 11:04 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by KEVIN A. DARBY on behalf of LOCALOC, INC Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/24/2024. (DARBY, KEVIN) |