AC/DC Solar, LLC
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jacob A Brown |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-01582 |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
AC/DC Solar, LLC
9942 Currie Davis Dr Ste B
Tampa, FL 33619-2667 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Request for Notice
Fri 04/26 6:15 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (AIS Portfolio Services, LP (AS)) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
trustee
(NO PAPER) - Chapter 11 - Continuance of Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/22 5:12 PM
The United States Trustee states that the initial meeting of creditors was held and continued to the following date to allow further examination of the debtor(s) and/or the records of the debtor(s). Filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2024 at 01:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. (Buenaventura, Bryan) |
||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
CHAP Pro Memo - Hearing Held
Tue 04/16 5:23 PM
Hearing Proceeding Memo: Hearing Held - APPEARANCES: Buddy Ford: Debtor; Ruediger Mueller: Subchapter V Trustee; Bryan Buenaventura: United States Trustee WITNESSES: EVIDENCE: RULING: 1. Initial Status Conference Held and continued to May 14, 2024 @ 2:30 p.m. AOCNFN -Verified Small Business Chapter 11 Balance Sheet, Operations and Cash-Flow Statement and Income Tax Returns Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. Doc 5 -Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. Doc 7 -Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. Doc 25 2. Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC Doc 15 Granted on an Interim Basis (terms/conditions stated on the record) continued hearing will be held May 14, 2024 @ 2:30 p.m. Order Ford 3. Preliminary Hearing on Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Jay Metzer. Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC Doc 16 Approved on an Interim Basis (modifications/terms stated on the record) continued hearing will be held May 14, 2024 @ 2:30 p.m. Order Ford 4. Preliminary Hearing on Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Ziv Metzer. Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC Doc 17 Approved on an Interim Basis (modifications/terms stated on the record) continued hearing will be held May 14, 2024 @ 2:30 p.m. Order Ford Note: -341 Meeting of Creditors Scheduled for April 22, 2024 @ 2:00 p.m. -Order Directing the Clerk to Reassign Case to the Hon. Jacob A. Brown Doc 6 -Chapter 11 Plan of Reorginaztion due on or before June 24, 2024 Proposed Orders, if applicable, should be submitted within three days after the date of the hearing - Local Rule 9072-1(c). This docket entry/document is not an official order of the Court . (Bill) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Pre-Status Conference Report
Fri 04/12 11:03 AM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 04/11 2:01 PM
Expedited Notice of Hearing on Expedited Application for Fixing Salary of Ziv Metzer Retroactive to the Petition Date Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2024 at 03:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . (Semach, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 04/11 1:29 PM
Expedited Notice of Hearing on Expedited Application for Fixing Salary of Jay Metzer Retroactive to the Petition Date Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2024 at 03:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . (Semach, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 04/11 1:16 PM
Expedited Notice of Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral Retroactive to the Petition Date and Providing Adequate Protection Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC . Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2024 at 03:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . (Semach, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors | ||
court
ADI - Reminder to Prepare and Serve Notice of Hearing
Thu 04/11 11:53 PM
The Court reminds Jonathan A Semach to prepare, file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties. Re: Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 4/16/24 3:00 pm Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Re: Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Jay Metzer. Doc16 . If notice of the hearing is not filed and served within 48 hours of this reminder, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, at its discretion, may deny the relief requested. (ADIclerk) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK)
Thu 04/11 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 04/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
Notice Canceling and/or Rescheduling (BK)
Mon 04/08 12:00 PM
Notice Rescheduling Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/16/2024 at 03:00 PM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . (Nancy) |
|
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 04/08 11:58 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 4/16/24 3:00 pm Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Re: Motion to Use Cash Collateral Doc15 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jonathan A Semach to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 04/08 11:58 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 4/16/24 3:00 pm Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Re: Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Jay Metzer. Doc16 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jonathan A Semach to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Mon 04/08 11:59 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 4/16/24 3:00 pm Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street. Re: Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Ziv Metzer. Doc17 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Jonathan A Semach to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Sunday, April 07, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order
Mon 04/08 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order . Notice Date 04/07/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/05 5:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bert Echols III on behalf of Creditor TD Bank, N.A., successor in interest to TD Auto Finance LLC. (Echols, Bert) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Application to Set Officers' Salary
Fri 04/05 12:58 PM
Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Ziv Metzer . Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
16 | 16
motion
Application to Set Officers' Salary
Fri 04/05 12:57 PM
Application to Set Officers' Salary re: Jay Metzer . Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
15 | 15
6
pgs
motion
Motion to Use Cash Collateral
Fri 04/05 11:34 AM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Jonathan A Semach on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "A" | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Prescribing Procedures - Ch. 11 SubV Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, Set Status Conf
Fri 04/05 10:17 AM
Order Prescribing Procedures in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case, Setting Deadline for Filing Plan, and Setting Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 4/30/2024 at 01:30 PM at Jacksonville, FL - Courtroom 4C, 4th Floor, Bryan Simpson United States Courthouse, 300 North Hogan Street . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Vivianne) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request for Notice
Mon 04/01 7:07 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company, LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (AIS Portfolio Services, LP (AS)) |
|
Sunday, March 31, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 04/01 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 03/31/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 03/30 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 03/29/2024. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Fri 03/29 11:15 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/22/2024 at 02:00 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/4/2024. (Ryan S.) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
trustee
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee
Thu 03/28 11:52 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11, Subchapter V Trustee Ruediger Mueller and Verified statement . Ruediger Mueller added to the case. Filed by Bryan E Buenaventura on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Buenaventura, Bryan) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Thu 03/28 11:48 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Bryan E Buenaventura on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Buenaventura, Bryan) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Wed 03/27 12:08 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Wed 03/27 5:55 AM
Order Directing the Clerk to Reassign Case to the Hon. Jacob A. Brown . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Anel) |
|
court
Reassignment of Case (BK) Paperless
Wed 03/27 5:57 AM
This case, including any related pending adversary proceedings, has been reassigned to the The Honorable Jacob A. Brown. Any hearings previously scheduled before the The Honorable Catherine Peek McEwen are canceled and will be rescheduled. (Anel) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Operations for Small Business
Tue 03/26 2:42 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Tue 03/26 2:37 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
3 | 3
5
pgs
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Tue 03/26 2:37 PM
Application to Employ Buddy D. Ford, P. A. as Counsel for Debtor Contains negative notice. Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Application to Employ | ||
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Tue 03/26 2:33 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of Debtor AC/DC Solar, LLC. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
1 | 1
60
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 03/26 2:32 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Buddy D Ford on behalf of AC/DC Solar, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/24/2024. (Ford, Buddy) |
|
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Tue 03/26 2:35 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8:24-bk-01582] ) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number A74920597, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Tue 03/26 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |