California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cv-02463
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 1:38 AM PDT
Movant
Catherine Anz
Movant
Astellas Pharma USA Inc.
Movant
Bayview Research Group, LLC
Movant
Michael Feist
Movant
Karen Hung
Movant
Pfizer, Inc


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 04/03 4:48 PM
Application for Refund re: Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form,,2 (Traylor, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Terminate Attorney Civil Case Opening - optional html form Wed 04/03 11:26 AM
In response to the opening of this case, the Clerk issued a Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Attorney Case Opening. The Notice indicated that unless counsel corrected the identified discrepancy within two business days, the docket for this case number would be closed and no further filings would be permitted under this case number. Counsel has not corrected the discrepancy. Accordingly, this case is now closed. No further filings may be made under this case number, except, if applicable, to request a refund of fees using a Form G-124, Application for Refund of Fees. Should you wish to pursue this action, a new case must be filed and a new case number issued. (Case Terminated.) (ghap)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
1 1 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 03/28 10:54 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. (ghap)
Related: [-]