Price v. LeBlanc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | Thomas P Leblanc |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00425 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 33rd JDC Allen Parish, C-23-00396 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Assistant Warden Jessie Bellamy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warden Keith Cooley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Captain Gloria Griffin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chaplain Ricky Kennon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James LeBlanc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Assistant Warden Brent Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colonel Bobby Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Quincy Price
531675 3751 Lauderdale Woodyard Rd
Kinder, LA 70648 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Thu 04/11 2:14 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:7 MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Remand
Thu 04/11 1:57 PM
MOTION to Remand by Quincy Price. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/11/2024.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Sec P - Deficiency Order
Mon 04/08 9:32 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. (Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/6/2024). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/5/2024.(crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 1983 Civil Rights form | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Fri 04/05 4:59 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 4/5/2024. (crt,Jones, P) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/02 2:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jessie Bellamy, Keith Cooley, Gloria Griffin, Ricky Kennon, James LeBlanc, Brent Thompson, Bobby Young.(aty,Dara, Joshua) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 04/01 2:12 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/1/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 04/01 2:11 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/1/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 12:30 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Quincy Price. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/26/2024. (crt,Devillier, W) ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture motion relief requested within pdf of Doc 1-1. Modified to assign document number on 4/1/2024 (Devillier, W) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Service Return for LeBlanc, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Request for Service on Kennon, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Service Return for Young, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Service Return for Thompson, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Service Return for Griffin, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Service Return for Bellamy, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Service Return for Cooley, | ||
Att: 9 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/01 1:31 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W) |
||
utility
Motions Transferred
Mon 04/01 3:09 PM
Motions Transferred regarding 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W) Modified to edit file date on 4/1/2024 (Devillier, W) |