Alaryan v. R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Allison D Burroughs |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10779 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Middlesex Superior Court (Woburn), 2481cv00039 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 4:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
JOHN DOE
|
|
Defendant
R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C., OH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rami Alaryan
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Reissued
Thu 04/25 1:33 PM
Summons Reissued as to Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Aaron Watts. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 04/25 10:08 AM
Defendant Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc. d/b/a R+L Carriers' ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc..(Shireman, Justin) |
|
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 04/25 9:58 AM
Defendant Aaron Watts's ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Aaron Watts.(Shireman, Justin) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 9:53 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc.. (Shireman, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/23 12:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rami Alaryan.(Bita, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Amend
Tue 04/16 9:55 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING12 Motion to Amend Complaint. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/16 9:49 AM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered GRANTING11 Assented to MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Motions to dismiss8 withdrawn. (McManus, Caetlin) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Amend
Mon 04/15 11:25 AM
Assented to MOTION to Amend1 Notice of Removal, Complaint by Rami Alaryan.(Bita, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw
Mon 04/15 10:14 AM
Assented to MOTION to Withdraw8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Count II of the Complaint by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C..(Shireman, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/02 6:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand as to Counts I and III of Plaintiff's Complaint by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C..(Shireman, Justin) |
|
9 | 9
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 04/02 6:18 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Count II of the Complaint filed by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C..(Shireman, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 04/02 6:17 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM as Count II of the Complaint by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C..(Shireman, Justin) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/29 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Bita, III on behalf of Rami Alaryan (Bita, John) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Thu 03/28 2:56 PM
STATE COURT Record. (Shireman, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Wed 03/27 10:41 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/27 9:07 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet
Wed 03/27 8:53 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re1 Notice of Removal, Revised Category Sheet by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C.. (Shireman, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 4:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C. identifying Other Affiliate Greenwood Motor Lines, Inc., Other Affiliate R&L Carriers, Inc., Other Affiliate R&L Transfer, Inc., Other Affiliate Gator Freightways, Inc., Other Affiliate Paramount Transportation Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate R.L.R. Investments, LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas R Meyer, Other Affiliate Mary D Roberts, Other Affiliate Roby L Roberts, Other Affiliate Brice Carpenter, Other Affiliate Michelle R Carpenter, Other Affiliate Kindel Stephens, Other Affiliate Ralph L. Roberts Declaration of Trust dated 2/4/1994, Other Affiliate Mary D. Roberts Declaration of Trust dated 2/4/1994, as amended, Other Affiliate Roby L. Roberts Declaration of Trust dated 2/7/1996, as amended, Other Affiliate Michelle R. Carpenter Declaration of Trust dated 7/25/1995, as amended, Other Affiliate 2012 Roby Lee Roberts Family Trust, Other Affiliate December 1998 Carpenter Trust, Other Affiliate RLM Holdings, L.L.C. for R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C... (Shireman, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by R&L Carrier Shared Services, L.L.C. ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10335570 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Shireman, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Complaint and other papers, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Civil Action Cover Sheet |