Gerlach v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Sheri Polster Chappell |
Referred: | Nicholas P Mizell |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00271 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court 20th Judicial Circuit, 24-000499 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joan Gerlach
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
Mon 04/15 3:09 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file a reply. Pursuant to Rule 7(a)(7), plaintiff may file a reply in avoidance of defendant's affirmative defenses by April 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/15/2024. (TLP) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/12 10:12 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Reply in Avoidance of Affirmative Defenses by Joan Gerlach. (Cassel, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 04/12 9:37 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 17 joint motion to mediate by videoconference. The court is satisfied with the parties' assurances that mediation by videoconference would be just as likely to resolve this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/12/2024. (TLP) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/11 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Appear at Mediation Virtually by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
16 | 16
adr
Notice of selection of mediator
Thu 04/11 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF SELECTION of Gerald Albrecht as mediator by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of mediation conference/hearing
Thu 04/11 10:35 AM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 25, 2024 at 1:30pm before Gerald T. Albrecht.(Albrecht, Gerald) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Compliance notice
Wed 04/03 5:01 PM
NOTICE of compliance re10 Civil Action Order Familiarity with Local Rules and Orders by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 03/29 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tracy Ann Jurgus on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Lead Counsel: Tracy A. Jurgus. (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
12 | 12
order
Protective Order
Fri 03/29 11:35 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/29/2024.(WRW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
11 | 11
order
Case Management Scheduling Order
Fri 03/29 11:33 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: (HURRICANE IAN) Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/29/2024. (WRW) |
|
10 | 10
order
Civil Action Order
Fri 03/29 11:32 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/29/2024. (WRW) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/28 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Tracy Ann Jurgus on behalf of Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. Lead Counsel: Tracy A. Jurgus. (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 03/28 8:59 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Alan Cassel on behalf of Joan Gerlach. Lead Counsel: Michael A. Cassel. (Cassel, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Compliance notice
Thu 03/28 6:38 AM
NOTICE of compliance re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest (Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Wed 03/27 12:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest with Jury Demand filed by Joan Gerlach. Filed in State Court on 02/22/2024.(JK) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 12:13 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas A. Reeves of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 03/27 12:12 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Tracy Ann Jurgus of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/26 4:29 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:24-cv-271-SPC-NPM. (AA) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/26 3:12 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 2:50 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charlotte County, case number 2024-000499 filed in State Court on 2/22/24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21912259 filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest.(Jurgus, Tracy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet |