Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Jonker
Referred: Sally J Berens
Case #: 1:24-cv-00314
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 4:26 AM EDT
defendant
Himamauli Das
Represented By
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Michael James Gaffney
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
Christian Daniel
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
defendant
United States Department of the Treasury
Represented By
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Michael James Gaffney
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
Christian Daniel
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
defendant
Janet Yellen
Represented By
Nicole Mazzocco
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info
Michael James Gaffney
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
Christian Daniel
U.S. Department Of Justice (federal Programs - Civil Div.)
contact info
plaintiff
Chaldean American Chamber of Commerce
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Derek Dickow
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Timothy A. Eisenbraun
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Power Connections Co, LLC
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Semper Real Estate Advisors, LLC
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Small Business Association of Michigan
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
Steward Media Group, LLC
Represented By
Amanda Rauh-Bieri
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
D. Andrew Portinga
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info
Stephen James van Stempvoort
Miller Johnson Plc (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
53 53 appeal Letter from CCA Regarding Appeal Fri 05/02 2:25 PM
LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal52 assigning CASE NUMBER 25-1438 indicating that the appeal has been filed (slk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
52 52 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 05/01 10:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL re49 ,48 by defendants United States Department of the Treasury, Himamauli Das, Janet Yellen (Daniel, Christian)
Related: [-]