Greiner v. Democratic National Committee et al
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas O Rice |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00092 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:18 PM PDT |
Defendant
Democratic National Committee
|
|
Defendant
Republican National Committee
|
|
Plaintiff
James Greiner
108 N Buchanan Avenue Apt 205
Wenatchee, WA 98801 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Supplement
Fri 04/26 10:34 AM
Plaintiff's Amended Response to Motions to Dismiss and Strike (Supplement) re16 Response to Motion by James Greiner.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope | ||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 04/25 10:19 AM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Motions to Dismiss and Strike filed by James Greiner; re13 MOTION to Strike;10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim;12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/25 8:37 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Shawn G. Crowley added on behalf of the Democratic National Committee. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (KAW, Law Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/24 1:41 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Republican National Committee. (Maguire, Robert) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Strike
Fri 04/19 4:15 PM
MOTION to Strike3 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Republican National Committee. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Maguire, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 04/19 4:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Republican National Committee. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Maguire, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/19 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Maguire on behalf of Republican National Committee (Attorney Robert J Maguire added to party Republican National Committee(pty:dft))(Maguire, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim
Fri 04/19 3:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Democratic National Committee. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Sands, Darin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 3:35 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Shawn G. Crowley. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-4527417. by Democratic National Committee. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Sands, Darin) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/16 3:22 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Democratic National Committee. (Sands, Darin) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Darin M Sands on behalf of Democratic National Committee (Attorney Darin M Sands added to party Democratic National Committee(pty:dft))(Sands, Darin) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service
Mon 04/01 11:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE by James Greiner re Democratic National Committee, Republican National Committee.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Envelope | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization (Pro Se Filer Only)
Tue 03/26 1:34 PM
MOTION to Obtain Electronic Case Filing Authorization by James Greiner. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/26 1:14 PM
Summons Issued in Paper as to Democratic National Committee, Republican National Committee. Summonses mailed to James Greiner at the address of record this date.(LTR, Case Administrator) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/26/2024) (LTR, Case Administrator). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/26/2024) (LTR, Case Administrator). Modified on 3/26/2024: documents replaced to show Clerk's Seal. (LTR, Case Administrator). Modified on 3/26/2024 (LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Republican National Committee | ||
3 | 3
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 03/26 1:03 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by James Greiner. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement
Tue 03/26 1:00 PM
STATEMENT of Material Facts Not in Dispute re1 Complaint, by James Greiner. (LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 12:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Democratic National Committee, Republican National Committee (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Jury Demand. Filed by James Greiner.(LTR, Case Administrator) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Transmittal Envelope | ||
misc
Payment or Deposit Received
Tue 03/26 1:36 PM
Filing Fee Received. Receipt #27D22VDT in the amount of $405.00 from James Greiner. (LTR, Case Administrator) |