Ticheli v. Dolgencorp LLC et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00428 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 4th Judicial District Court, Parish of Ouachita, 20240401 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 5:10 PM CDT |
Defendant
DG Louisiana, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dolgencorp LLC
|
|
Defendant
Dollar General
|
|
Plaintiff
Miles Ticheli
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Response to Removal Order
Tue 04/23 2:53 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by DG Louisiana, LLC .(aty,Harrison, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complete State Court Record | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Removal Order
Thu 03/28 3:37 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/28/2024. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/27 4:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DG Louisiana, LLC.(aty,Harrison, Shannon) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/27 3:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DG Louisiana, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dolgencorp, LLC, Corporate Parent Dollar General Corporation for DG Louisiana, LLC. (aty,Harrison, Shannon) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/27 9:30 AM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Miles Ticheli. (aty,Heck, Charles) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 03/27 8:48 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/27/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 03/27 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Shannon O'Neill Harrison on behalf of DG Louisiana L L C AND to Charles H Heck, Jr on behalf of Miles Ticheli. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 4/10/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) Modified docket text on 3/27/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 03/27 8:45 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Shannon O'Neill Harrison on behalf of DG Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/10/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 4th JDC, Parish of Ouachita, Case Number 20240401 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5896719) filed by DG Louisiana, LLC.(Attorney Shannon O'Neill Harrison added to party DG Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Harrison, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Response to RFA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Correspondence with stipulation, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's response to email | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/27 8:41 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A) |