Linehan v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Patti B Saris |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10785 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Middlesex County Superior Court, 2481CV00748 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 6:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priya Viswanath
|
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Linehan
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice requesting courtesy copy
Wed 04/24 2:14 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for18 Opposition to Motion,17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 4/30/2024. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF and exhibits must be tabbed. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/16 2:47 PM
Opposition re14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings pending arbitration filed by Rachel Linehan.(Davis, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit myResolution Handbook, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit AAA Arbitration Road Map, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Email Correspondence | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
22
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 4:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re10 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 15, 2024 to File Response/Reply /Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Relief filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Keller, Eve) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Adam McAllister, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Andrew Waldron, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Amy Eby, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Libbi MacDonald, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit Priya Viswanath | ||
16 | 16
misc
Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court
Mon 04/15 2:38 PM
Proposed Document(s) submitted by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Document received: Motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings. (Keller, Eve) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Declaration
Mon 04/15 2:36 PM
DECLARATION re14 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Keller, Eve) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Compel
Mon 04/15 2:32 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and stay proceedings by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Keller, Eve) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Thu 04/04 12:04 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING BY VIDEO re6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 5/10/2024 11:15 AM BY VIDEO before Judge Patti B. Saris. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 04/04 11:15 AM
Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWED re10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response /Opposition re6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 4/15/2024. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 04/04 10:33 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Lincoln National Life Insurance Company served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/17/2024. (Davis, John) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/03 6:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to April 15, 2024 to File Response/Reply /Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Relief by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Keller, Eve) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
State Court Record - no answer filed in state court
Mon 04/01 11:58 AM
STATE COURT Record Lincoln National Life Insurance Company summons served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024.. (Sugumaran, Keerthi) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Expedite
Wed 03/27 4:44 PM
MOTION to Expedite by Rachel Linehan.(Davis, John) |
|
7 | 7
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 03/27 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Rachel Linehan. (Davis, John) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 03/27 4:41 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Rachel Linehan.(Davis, John) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 03/27 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ANY pending motions filed in the State Court requiring the attention of this court, please re-file into this District Court Record in accordance with Fed. R. Civil Procedures and Local Rules. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel
Wed 03/27 9:53 AM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Dore, Samantha) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/27 9:34 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Kinsella, Jaylannie) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/26 7:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eve R Keller on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Keller, Eve) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/26 5:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10335985 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Sugumaran, Keerthi) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Filings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Superior Court, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Category Form |