California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:24-cv-02487
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV05313
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 1:43 AM PDT
Defendant
Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC
Represented By
Emily Kate Harvin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Stuart Douglas Tochner
Ogleetree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Tiffany Delery
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
James M. Williams
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Daniel E. Buras, Jr.
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Huntsman International LLC
Represented By
Emily Kate Harvin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Stuart Douglas Tochner
Ogleetree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Tiffany Delery
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
James M. Williams
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Daniel E. Buras, Jr.
Chehardy Sherman Williams Recile And Hayes LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Marvin Cropper
Represented By
Arthur Kim
Arthur Kim Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 04/14 4:58 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Marvin Cropper(Kim, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
31 31 order Dismiss Case Fri 03/21 8:47 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS27 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint by no later than April 14, 2025. Defendant shall file an Answer or respond to the FAC, if filed, by no later than May 5, 2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
30 30 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 10/21 11:10 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT27 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: The Courtroom Deputy Clerk issues the Court's tentative ruling, prior to the hearing. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Counsel for Plaintiff: Arthur Kim. Counsel for Defendants: James M. Williams. Courtroom Deputy: Rita Sanchez. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. Time in Court: 20. (rs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
28 28 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 09/30 11:24 PM
Plaintiff Marvin Cropper's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case FRCP 12(b)(6) or alternatively, FRCP 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities 27 filed by Plaintiff Marvin Cropper.(Kim, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Arthur Kim in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Arthur Kim in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Monday, August 19, 2024
27 27 motion Dismiss Case Mon 08/19 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case FRCP 12(b)(6) or alternatively, FRCP 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement; Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Defendants' FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, or alternatively, FRCP 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement,
Att: 2 Declaration of Tiffany L. Delery ISO Defendants' FRCP 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively, FRCP 12(e) Motion for a More Definite Statement,
Att: 3 Exhibit A, 8.16.24 Tiffany Delery's email to Arthur Kim to Meet and Confer,
Att: 4 Exhibit B, 8.19.24 Tiffany Delery's email to Arthur Kim to Meet and Confer
Thursday, July 18, 2024
26 26 order Amend/Correct Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/19 11:40 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE12 23 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC and Huntsman International LLC, designating Emily Kate Harvin as local counsel. Granting12 23 Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams (rolm)
Related: [-]
25 25 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 07/18 4:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. James Williams' Amended Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case23 filed 7/17/2024 is accepted as filed. The Court will issue a separate Order granting the Application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Thu 07/18 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/26/2024, Receipt No.23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 07/17 9:08 PM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/26/2024, Receipt No. 37169745) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice
22 22 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 07/17 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Amended APPLICATION to AMEND APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt N12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests.. Application.. Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document is an Application not a MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT. (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/16 1:40 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Marvin Cropper. upon Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/20/2024, answer due 8/19/2024; Huntsman International LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/20/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Tiffany Delery. (Kim, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
16 16 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 03/28 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC, re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169745)7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form14 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Related Case(s)4 , Declaration5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form13 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form,,11 , Amended APPLICATION to AMEND APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt N12 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel E. Buras, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169874)10 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tiffany Delery to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169842)9 , Corporate Disclosure Statement6 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Inemesit U. O'Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169812)8 by U.S. Mail and Electronic served on 03/28/2024. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/28 11:47 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
14 14 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/28 11:47 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/28 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/01 2:44 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald Granting10 Non-Resident Attorney Daniel E Buras APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Material Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC, designating Emily K Harvin as local counsel. (bm)
Related: [-]
19 19 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/01 2:42 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald Granting9 Non-Resident Attorney Tiffany Delery APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Material Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC, designating Emily K Harvin as local counsel. (bm)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/01 2:39 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald Granting8 Non-Resident Attorney Inemesit U O'Boyle APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Hunstman Advanced Material Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC, designating Emily K Harvin as local counsel. (bm)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 03/28 3:27 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice7 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The document is stricken. (iv)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/27 3:23 PM
Amended APPLICATION to AMEND APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169745)7 filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
11 11 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 03/27 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169745)7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Other error(s) with document(s): Applicant failed to list state bars where they are admitted. Only listed appellate and district courts. See Instructions for Applicants (1)(G-64). (lt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/26 6:54 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Daniel E. Buras, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169874) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/26 6:48 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tiffany Delery to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169842) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/26 6:40 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Inemesit U. O'Boyle to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169812) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/26 6:29 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James M. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-37169745) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Application
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/26 4:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC identifying Huntsman Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Tue 03/26 4:44 PM
DECLARATION of Rachel Muir re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 in support of filed by Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Related Case(s) Tue 03/26 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. no related cases (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/26 4:36 PM
Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC, identifying Huntsman Corporation. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/26 4:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. (Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/26 4:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV05313 Receipt No: ACACDC-37168481 - Fee: $405, filed by defendants Huntsman International LLC, Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC. (Attorney Emily Kate Harvin added to party Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Emily Kate Harvin added to party Huntsman International LLC(pty:dft))(Harvin, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Thu 03/28 11:34 AM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Huntsman Advanced Materials Americas LLC, Huntsman International LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marvin Cropper. [FILED IN STATE COURT 2/29/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]