Haymie v. Young Brothers, LLC
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth J Mansfield |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00139 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 46:688 Jones Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 26, 2024 2:08 PM HST |
Defendant
Young Brothers, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Tynian Haymie
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM HST |
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/28 11:05 AM
NOTICE by Tynian Haymie of Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge Tynian Haymie. (Easley, Preston) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/27 7:30 AM
Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements : Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/27 7:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. PLEASE COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM (FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED) . While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory . Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
Att: 1 Election Form | ||
6 | 6
misc
Civil Waiver of Service Packet
Wed 03/27 7:21 AM
CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(eta) |
|
Att: 1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, | ||
Att: 2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16
Wed 03/27 7:18 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/3/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/27/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/27 7:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Young Brothers, LLC. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 03/27 6:56 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00139 KJM on all further pleadings . (eta) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons (Proposed)
Tue 03/26 11:32 AM
Summons (Proposed) (Easley, Preston) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 11:31 AM
COMPLAINT For Damages and Demand for Jury Trial; Summons against Young Brothers, LLC, filed by Tynian Haymie.(Easley, Preston) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Interested Parties |