Montana District Court
Judge:Donald W Molloy
Case #: 9:24-cv-00038
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 2:28 AM MDT
Defendant
BWS ALK, LLC
Defendant
Kenneth Krupp
Defendant
Star Coach Race Tours, LLC
Plaintiff
JAL & JLL, LLC
Represented By
Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Hansberry & Jourdonnais, PLLC
contact info
Charles E. Hansberry
Hansberry & Jourdonnais, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Labute
Represented By
Jenny M. Jourdonnais
Hansberry & Jourdonnais, PLLC
contact info
Charles E. Hansberry
Hansberry & Jourdonnais, PLLC
contact info

GPO Aug 05 2024
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/5/2024. (NOS)

Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 08/05 4:27 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/5/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
2 2 1 pgs order Order Setting - MT Tue 07/09 3:16 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs must show cause why this case should not be dismissed by July 23, 2024. The failure to do so will result in the dismissal of their claims against Defendants without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/9/2024. (NOS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 03/26 2:16 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joel Labute, JAL & JLL, LLC. (TAG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 03/26 2:16 PM
Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3233831 (TAG)
Related: [-]