New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:24-cv-02169
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2024
Case in other court:Supreme Court of The State of NY, County of Nassau, 602810/2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 21, 2024 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Laura J Gindele
Rivkin Radler LLP
contact info
Michael A. Troisi
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elyho Malekan
Represented By
Dennis T. D'Antonio
Weg And Myers, P.C.
contact info
Daniel Carlisle
Weg And Myers, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 11:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The status conference scheduled for May 21, 2025 is CANCELED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/30/2025. (DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 04/29 5:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Elyho Malekan. (Carlisle, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 14, 2025
order Scheduling Order Mon 04/14 1:18 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the status conference scheduled for May 5, 2025 is ADJOURNED to May 21, 2025 at 10:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/14/2025. (DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/30 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tamika N. Hardy on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (aty to be noticed) (Hardy, Tamika)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 28, 2024
order Scheduling Order Sat 12/28 1:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the recent discovery extension, the in-person status conference scheduled for January 6, 2025 is ADJOURNED to May 5, 2025 at 10:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/28/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/23 12:22 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Upon the parties' joint request, the proposed amended discovery schedule, found at docket entry No. [15-1], is hereby ADOPTED and SO ORDERED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/23/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
15 15 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 12/20 1:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Elyho Malekan. (Carlisle, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Discovery Plan Worksheet
Thursday, May 09, 2024
14 14 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/09 10:33 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (DM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/08 9:22 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Gindele, Laura)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
12 12 minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/30 10:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields:Initial Conference Hearing held on 4/29/2024. An in-person status conference shall be held on January 6, 2025 at 10:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse.(FTR Log #12:05-12:10.) (JT)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Mon 04/29 12:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth on the record during the initial conference held today, by June 28, 2024, the documents set forth in paragraph 7 of the joint initial letter shall exchanged. In the event that the Defendant withholds any document on the basis of privilege, Defendant is directed to produce a privilege log describing all documents being withheld and the privilege being claimed. Counsel are directed to confer regarding the undersigned's confidentiality order, and submit such for this Court's approval by May 7, 2024. Additionally, the parties' proposed discovery schedule found at docket entry No. [11-1] is hereby ADOPTED ad SO ORDERED as the discovery schedule for this matter with the following modification: Rather than the proposed July 15, 2024 date, the in-person status conference shall be held on January 6, 2025 at 10:30 AM in courtroom 840 of the Central Islip courthouse. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/29/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 27, 2024
order Scheduling Order Sat 04/27 8:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the initial conference scheduled for April 29, 2024 at 1:30 PM is CONVERTED to a telephone conference and the time of the conference is ADVANCED to 12:00 PM. Counsel are directed to call the AT&T Teleconference Center at (877) 810-9415 at the time of the conference and enter Access Code 9005911 when prompted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/27/2024. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 misc Letter Thu 04/25 9:39 AM
Letter Joint Initial Letter by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company (Gindele, Laura)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Discovery Plan Worksheet
Friday, March 29, 2024
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/29 11:41 AM
ORDER: An IN PERSON Initial Conference is set for 4/29/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/29/2024. (JT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS RULES
Thursday, March 28, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/28 12:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company. (Gindele, Laura)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
8 8 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 03/26 10:10 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/26 9:13 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company (Gindele, Laura)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/26 2:57 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 03/26 2:58 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Carlisle on behalf of Elyho Malekan (aty to be noticed) (Carlisle, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis T. D'Antonio on behalf of Elyho Malekan (aty to be noticed) (D'Antonio, Dennis)
Related: [-]
4 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elyho Malekan (D'Antonio, Dennis)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Troisi on behalf of State Farm Fire And Casualty Company (aty to be noticed) (Troisi, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet.. by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company (Gindele, Laura)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire And Casualty Company from Supreme Court, case number 602810/2024. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-17703523) (Gindele, Laura) Modified on 3/26/2024 (CL).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Ex. B - DFS Letter
Notice: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 page of the Civil Cover Sheet. Please answer NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE question to 2 (a)(b)(c) Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]