Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:24-cv-00273
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC
Represented By
David Sydney Harvey
Kelley Kronenberg
contact info
Jonathan A. Beckerman
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Shannon Elizabeth Murphy
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Nicole Vescova
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smiith
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Ronquillo
Represented By
Benjamin H. Yormak
Yormak Employment & Disability Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/03 9:46 AM
TEXT ORDER. The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. 33 ). The Stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 4/3/2025. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/02 4:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC.(Beckerman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
32 32 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 03/27 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
31 31 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/26 2:01 PM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Settlement. (Doc. 30 ). Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of any party within thirty days to file another paper per Local Rule 3.09(b) or to move to reopen the case, which motion the Court would liberally grant. If no such papers have been filed within this thirty-day period, the dismissal of this case shall be with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is now DIRECTED to deny all pending motions as moot, terminate any deadlines, and close the case, subject to reopening if the parties file an appropriate motion within the thirty-day deadline set forth above. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 3/26/2025. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of settlement Tue 03/25 9:32 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Marie Ronquillo (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
29 29 order Order Mon 03/24 12:17 PM
TEXT ORDER. The mediator has reported a settlement. (Doc. 28 ). No later than 03/31/2025, the parties are DIRECTED to file a notice of settlement in accordance with Local Rule 3.09(a). Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 3/24/2025. (BPC)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
28 28 adr Mediation report Fri 03/21 12:36 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 20, 2025. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Quintana, Marlene)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Wed 02/26 9:57 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on March 20, 2025 at 9:00 A.M. before Ms. Marlene Quintana. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
26 26 notice Compliance notice Thu 06/20 5:06 PM
NOTICE of compliance re 24 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC (Murphy, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 06/17 3:28 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC. (Beckerman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 06/17 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Shannon Elizabeth Murphy of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 06/17 1:22 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David S. Harvey will have no further responsibility for this action. The clerk will discontinue sending CM/ECF notices to Harvey and terminate him from this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/17/2024. (BLW)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 06/17 12:28 PM
MOTION for to Withdraw as Attorney [David S. Harvey, Esquire] by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC. (Harvey, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of appearance Mon 06/17 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Elizabeth Murphy on behalf of Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC (Murphy, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 06/12 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jonathan A. Beckerman on behalf of Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jonathan A. Beckerman. (Beckerman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
19 19 order Order Tue 06/11 11:29 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 18 attorney Davis S. Harvey's Notice of Withdrawal. The Court's local rules do not permit an attorney to withdraw by notice. See Local Rule 2.02(c). And the motion does not otherwise comply with the directives of Local Rule 2.02(c) or Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 6/11/2024. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/10 4:06 PM
NOTICE by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendant (Harvey, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 06/10 2:29 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/10/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 8/10/2024; Discovery due by 5/23/2025; Dispositive motions due by 6/20/2025; Pretrial statement due by 12/5/2025; All other motions due by 12/1/2025; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/22/2025; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/24/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2025 at 01:30 PM via Zoom Video Conference before Judge John L. Badalamenti; Jury Trial set for 1/5/2026 trial term in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/30/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/10/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Preliminary pretrial conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 06/10 2:22 PM
Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek: granting 14 Defendant's Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Designation of Lead Counsel and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/17/24; RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE held on 6/10/2024. (Digital) (CGW)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Mon 06/10 2:19 PM
ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Designation of Counsel and Corporate Disclosure statement by 6/17/24 by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of appearance Fri 06/07 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A. Beckerman on behalf of Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC (Beckerman, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of appearance Fri 06/07 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Vescova on behalf of Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC (Vescova, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 27, 2024
11 11 misc Case Management Report Mon 05/27 4:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Fri 04/19 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Rule 16(b) hearing previously scheduled for 6/4/24 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2024 at 02:00 PM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 5/28/2024. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record. (CGW)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/19 9:34 AM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 6/4/2024 at 09:45 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 5/28/2024. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/18 12:42 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC.(Harvey, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of service executed Fri 04/05 10:01 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/5/2024 by Marie Ronquillo as to Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 order Civil Action Order Thu 03/28 11:59 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/28/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
5 5 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/27 9:21 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-273-JLB-KCD. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 03/26 9:42 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Benjamin H. Yormak on behalf of Marie Ronquillo. Lead Counsel: Benjamin H. Yormak, Esq.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/26 9:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Marie Ronquillo. (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 03/26 9:41 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marie Ronquillo. Related case(s): No (Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/26 9:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Storm Smart Building Systems, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21913915) filed by Marie Ronquillo.(Yormak, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet