Le v. Director of Asylum Office in Miami
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Julie S Sneed |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00582 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 1:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Director of Asylum Office in Miami
|
|
Plaintiff
Tin Le
12014 Language Way
Orlando, FL 32832 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order to show cause
Wed 04/17 10:37 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Tin Le. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order 3 . Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of the case without further notice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 4/17/2024. (GNB) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
13
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/27 2:37 PM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Julie S. Sneed on 3/27/2024. (GNB) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Wed 03/27 11:28 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Director of Asylum Office in Miami. (GL) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Fees Paid
Tue 03/26 2:43 PM
FEES Paid by Tin Le (Filing fee $405.00, Receipt Number ORL111166). (JG) |
||
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against Director of Asylum Office in Miami filed by Tin Le. (Check hasn't processed)(AJS) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Mailing Envelope |