Ellis v. Pinellas County Sheriff's Department et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Amanda Arnold Sansone |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00741 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/12 1:21 PM
ORDER dismissing with prejudice the claim against Pinellas County Sheriff's Office; dismissing the claim against Sheriff Gualtieri without prejudice and with leave to amend; denying without prejudice Ellis's 2 3 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis . No later than 45 DAYS from the date of this Order, Ellis must file an amended complaint on the standard form and either pay the filing fee or submit proof of indigency. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enclose with this Order the standard form for a federal civil rights complaint and a "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/12/2024. (JT) |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 3:15 PM
SECOND MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (short form) by Avery Ellis.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/26 3:10 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Avery Ellis.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT against Bob Gualtieri, Pinellas County Sheriff's Department filed by Avery Ellis.(LD) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope |