Dominguez-Garcia v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Mary S Scriven |
Referred: | Christopher P Tuite |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00760 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 1:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Director, Tampa Field Office
|
|
Plaintiff
Aidelyn Dominguez-Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Thu 04/25 4:16 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Aidelyn Dominguez-Garcia. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 4/1/2024, answer due 5/31/2024.(Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Certified Mail Tracking and Delivery Confirmation | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons issued as to USA
Wed 03/27 12:30 PM
SUMMONS issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (GL) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/27 8:53 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-760-MSS-CPT. (AJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 6:00 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Director, Tampa Field Office (Filing fee $405 receipt number BFLMDC-21913808) filed by Aidelyn Dominguez-Garcia.(Dominguez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix Appendix to Complaint |