West Shore Home, LLC v. Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas P Barber |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00761 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1346 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 1:07 AM EDT |
Defendant
Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
West Shore Home, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/25 2:29 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by West Shore Home, LLC. Related case(s): No (Esposito, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 04/24 3:07 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC (CDR) |
|
12 | 12
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Clerks Default
Wed 04/24 2:56 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter default against Defendant. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.10, Plaintiff shall, within 35 days of entry of the Clerk's default, apply for default judgment or file a paper identifying each unresolved issue necessary to entry of the default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams on 4/24/2024. (CJF) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Clerks Default
Tue 04/23 4:08 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Default against Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC by West Shore Home, LLC. (Esposito, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed Proof of service
Tue 04/23 4:02 PM
RETURN of service executed on March 29, 2024 by West Shore Home, LLC as to Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC., PROOF of service by West Shore Home, LLC (Esposito, Michael) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 10:17 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Mon 04/08 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Tue 04/02 7:25 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael R. Esposito on behalf of West Shore Home, LLC. Lead Counsel: Michael R. Esposito. (Esposito, Michael) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/28 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicole Rory Topper of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Thu 03/28 9:52 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Thu 03/28 9:51 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC. (CTR) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 03/27 2:28 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-761-TPB-UAM. (AA) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 7:07 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by West Shore Home, LLC identifying Corporate Parent West Shore Home Holdings, LLC for West Shore Home, LLC.. (Esposito, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 6:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Castle Credit Co Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21913863) filed by West Shore Home, LLC.(Esposito, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Castle Credit Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Castle Credit Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Summons |