Aghalarov v. Jaddou et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Leo T Sorokin |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-10766 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 1:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Meghann Boyle
|
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Defendant
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Plaintiff
Vugar Aghalarov
327 Boston Post Road Unit E
Sudbury, MA 01776 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/26 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. O'Connor on behalf of Meghann Boyle, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas (O'Connor, Nicole) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Copy Mailed
Wed 04/03 8:26 AM
Copy re4 General Order 19-02,6 Summons Issued,1 Complaint mailed to Vugar Aghalarov on 4/3/2024. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/03 8:21 AM
Summons Issued as to Meghann Boyle, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Dore, Samantha) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Filing Fee/Payment Received
Tue 04/02 1:47 PM
Filing fee/payment: $ 405.00, receipt number 100007140 for1 Complaint (Barbosa, Nilsa) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
General Order 19-02
Tue 03/26 12:01 PM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (Cook, Savannah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/26 10:26 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Cowan, Nicole) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases
Tue 03/26 10:06 AM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Meghann Boyle, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, filed by Vugar Aghalarov. (Cook, Savannah) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Form, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Letter |