Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 98.243.180.217
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Jonker |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00315 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 27, 2024 1:06 AM EDT |
defendant
John Doe
|
|
plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 04/08 12:11 PM
ORDER granting5 motion for leave to file; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 04/05 3:34 PM
MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, | ||
Att: 2 Stalzer Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright
Thu 03/28 3:06 PM
REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (eod) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint | ||
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Wed 03/27 12:29 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod) |
|
service
Summons Not Issued
Wed 03/27 12:30 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 98.243.180.217 (none provided) (eod) |
||
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/26 6:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 03/26 6:44 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 03/26 6:46 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7330904 (Bernier, Joel) |