Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Jeremy C Daniel
Case #: 1:24-cv-02463
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 22, 2024 4:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Yettsa
Defendant
QIYIWRB US
Defendant
Quex Company
Defendant
SENXUAN Co.Ltd
Defendant
Snatched And Gains
Defendant
TOBAOBO
Defendant
TTtshop
Defendant
TVTimeDirect
Defendant
WEINININ
Defendant
WZK-US
Defendant
Waist Away by Moojy
Defendant
WindQuickSports Sports & Outdoor
Defendant
Xiaomei---US
Defendant
YELANKUAJING STORE
Defendant
YUANQUQU
Defendant
PreHomes
Defendant
Z-uk
Defendant
caijunSHANGMAO
Defendant
chaonanfuzhuangguan
Defendant
cocobirds
Defendant
ebestshop4u
Defendant
feng88
Defendant
fuqingshisanshanzhenzhengkailiubaihuolingshouchaos
Defendant
jaya collection llc
Defendant
kean XinJISHU store
Defendant
liuxingyudejingpindi
Defendant
sexythings
Defendant
xiangweibaihuodian
Defendant
xuguochao shop
Defendant
zhukengtengUS
Defendant
EEEkit
Defendant
The Individuals, Business Entities, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Defendant
ANBAO Co.Ltd
Defendant
Al FITNESS
Defendant
Aniolzd
Defendant
Aniolzd Store
Defendant
BeautyCabin
Defendant
Bright Skin Cosmetics
Defendant
CARTONGO LLC
Defendant
DNK-I FAMILY GIFTS
Defendant
Daenzy
Defendant
Daphne Tate
Defendant
DarkQueens
Defendant
Dongguan Wangsuchuan Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
Exgreem Trading Inc.
Defendant
FITNESS CENTER
Defendant
FitPro
Defendant
GAOGUSHANGMAO
Defendant
GZYY STORE
Defendant
HADAN
Defendant
Jinan Nanju Network Technology Co., LTD
Defendant
Jingzhuo Network Technology Co., Ltd.
Defendant
LWDUDE
Defendant
LZY US
Defendant
LiTJiaY
Defendant
NY Trendz Corp.
Plaintiff
Hexin Holding Limited
Represented By
Yifei Deng
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Faye Yifei Deng
Yk Law LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kikevite
Terminated: 08/09/2024


Docket last updated: 02/10/2025 4:16 PM CST
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
1 1 13 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Hexin Holding Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21788039.(Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 37 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 55 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 48 pgs Exhibit 5
2 2 1 pgs CIVIL Cover Sheet (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Hexin Holding Limited (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs Notice of claims involving patent by Hexin Holding Limited (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs MOTION by Plaintiff Hexin Holding Limited for leave to file Under Seal (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Hexin Holding Limited SCHEDULE "A" related to COMPLAINT 1 (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hexin Holding Limited by Yifei Deng (Deng, Yifei)
Related: [-]